US HB4426 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sustainable Energy Development Reform Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sustainable Energy Development Reform Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2017-12-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2017-11-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-11-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-11-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2017-11-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2017-11-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
2017-11-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2017-11-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-11-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4568 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
SB738 (Related) 2017-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB179 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB502 (Related) 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB825 (Related) 2017-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 231.
HB1731 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
HB2001 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2012 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB2059 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB2713 (Related) 2017-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB3533 (Related) 2017-08-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB3913 (Related) 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4103 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4126 (Related) 2017-10-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4252 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4490 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
SB175 (Related) 2017-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S343)
SB282 (Related) 2017-02-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB728 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1997-1999)
SB1105 (Related) 2017-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1911 (Related) 2017-10-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2176 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB6768 (Related) 2018-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Asia
Atmospheric science and weather
Building construction
Business records
Census and government statistics
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Commerce
Department of Energy
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Economic development
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Forests, forestry, trees
Free trade and trade barriers
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Historical and cultural resources
Housing and community development funding
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Mining
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
National and community service
Natural disasters
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Sales and excise taxes
Scientific communication
Seashores and lakeshores
Soil pollution
Solid waste and recycling
South Korea
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Trade agreements and negotiations
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Youth employment and child labor

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback