US HB4568 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enhancing Geothermal Production on Federal Lands Act This bill amends the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 to allow the Department of the Interior to award noncompetitive leases on up to 640 acres of certain federal land for geothermal development. Interior must lease the land at fair market value, publish a notice of any lease requests, and provide review of the final determination of fair market value. Lessees must make annual rental payments equal to those required for lands that are leased competitively. The bill exempts geothermal exploration test projects from complying with environmental review requirements under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA). Interior must designate portions of certain federal land as geothermal leasing priority areas. The bill sets forth requirements for environmental review under NEPA with respect to the priority areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing Geothermal Production on Federal Lands Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
2018-01-09HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-502.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-12-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4252 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB4426 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback