US HB1731 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RECLAIM Act of 2017 Revitalizing the Economy of Coal Communities by Leveraging Local Activities and Investing More Act of 2017 This bill amends the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 (SMCRA) to make specified funds available to the Department of the Interior through FY2021 for distribution to states and Indian tribes to promote economic revitalization, diversification, and development in economically distressed communities through the reclamation and restoration of land and water resources adversely affected by coal mining carried out before August 3, 1977.The bill prescribes general requirements for projects to reclaim abandoned mine lands and waters that are likely to create favorable conditions for the economic development of the project site or promote the general welfare through economic and community development of the area in which the project is conducted. Any such project shall be located in a community affected by a recent decline in mining.A state or Indian tribe that receives funds under this bill may retain a portion of them as necessary to supplement its acid mine drainage abatement and treatment fund for future operation and maintenance costs for the treatment of acid mine drainage associated with individual projects. The bill increases the minimum amount of funds that Interior must provide annually to states and Indian tribes for reclamation and restoration projects. The Government Accountability Office must conduct a study on the use of funds authorized by this bill. The Appalachian Regional Commission may provide grants to individuals or entities in the Appalachian region for projects that have been or that are eligible to be reclaimed or restored under SMCRA. The commission must relocate its headquarters from Washington, DC to the Appalachian region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RECLAIM Act of 2017 Revitalizing the Economy of Coal Communities by Leveraging Local Activities and Investing More Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
2017-10-19HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
2017-10-19HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-351, Part I.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-04-05HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-03-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2017-03-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-27HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB728 (Similar To) 2017-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1997-1999)
SB738 (Related) 2017-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4426 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback