US HB502 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 194-46-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To permanently reauthorize the Land and Water Conservation Fund. This bill amends the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to make permanent the authorization for the Land and Water Conservation Fund. No less than 1.5% of the annual authorized funding amount or $10 million, whichever is greater, shall be used for projects that secure recreational public access to existing federal public land for hunting, fishing, and other recreational purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To permanently reauthorize the Land and Water Conservation Fund.

Sponsors

Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]Rep. Patrick Meehan [R]Rep. David Reichert [R]Rep. Ryan Costello [R]
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]Rep. Niki Tsongas [D]Rep. Jared Huffman [D]Rep. Mike Thompson [D]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]Rep. John Faso [R]Rep. Peter King [R]
Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Jared Polis [D]Rep. Denny Heck [D]Rep. Mark Takano [D]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]Rep. Gwen Moore [D]Rep. John Garamendi [D]Rep. Paul Tonko [D]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]Rep. David Cicilline [D]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D]Rep. Judy Chu [D]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D]Rep. Don Beyer [D]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D]Rep. William Keating [D]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D]
Rep. James Langevin [D]Rep. Frank Pallone [D]Rep. Peter Welch [D]Rep. Scott Peters [D]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D]Rep. Steve Cohen [D]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]
Rep. Darren Soto [D]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D]Rep. Robert Scott [D]Rep. Julia Brownley [D]
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D]Rep. David Loebsack [D]Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. James McGovern [D]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R]Rep. Adam Schiff [D]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D]
Rep. Christopher Smith [R]Rep. Ann Kuster [D]Rep. Michael Doyle [D]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D]Rep. Timothy Walz [D]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D]Rep. Dina Titus [D]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D]
Rep. Lacy Clay [D]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D]Rep. Eliot Engel [D]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D]Rep. Louise Slaughter [D]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D]Rep. John Delaney [D]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D]Rep. Richard Nolan [D]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D]Rep. Adam Smith [D]Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D]Rep. Mike Quigley [D]
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R]Rep. Brian Higgins [D]Rep. Ron Kind [D]Rep. Katherine Clark [D]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I]Rep. Mark Sanford [R]Rep. John Larson [D]Rep. Seth Moulton [D]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]Rep. Dwight Evans [D]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D]Rep. Bobby Rush [D]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D]Rep. Jim Costa [D]
Rep. Thomas Garrett [R]Rep. Albio Sires [D]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. Betty McCollum [D]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D]Rep. Richard Neal [D]Rep. James Himes [D]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D]Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D]Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D]
Rep. Michael Capuano [D]Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]Rep. Norma Torres [D]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D]Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. Keith Ellison [D]Rep. Charlie Crist [D]Rep. Jose Serrano [D]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D]Rep. Terri Sewell [D]Rep. David Scott [D]Rep. Bill Foster [D]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]Rep. Leonard Lance [R]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]
Rep. John Lewis [D]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]Rep. Donald Norcross [D]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D]Rep. Anthony Brown [D]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D]Rep. Marc Veasey [D]Rep. John Yarmuth [D]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D]
Rep. David Rouzer [R]Rep. Susan Davis [D]Rep. Tim Murphy [R]Rep. Maxine Waters [D]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]Rep. Donald McEachin [D]Rep. Grace Meng [D]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D]Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Robin Kelly [D]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D]
Rep. Luis Correa [D]Rep. Jim Cooper [D]Rep. Ami Bera [D]Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D]Rep. Donald Payne [D]Rep. Tim Ryan [D]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D]Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D]Rep. Tom Cole [R]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D]Rep. Michael Turner [R]Rep. David Price [D]Rep. Sander Levin [D]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D]Rep. Al Lawson [D]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D]
Rep. Alma Adams [D]Rep. John Conyers [D]Rep. G. Butterfield [D]Rep. Ben Lujan [D]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. Juan Vargas [D]
Rep. Val Demings [D]Rep. Andre Carson [D]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D]Rep. Robert Brady [D]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D]Rep. Filemon Vela [D]
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D]Rep. Gene Green [D]Rep. Kathy Castor [D]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D]Rep. Karen Bass [D]
Rep. Danny Davis [D]Rep. Charles Dent [R]Rep. Al Green [D]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D]
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Ted Poe [R]Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Chris Collins [R]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R]Rep. Roger Marshall [R]Rep. Tom Reed [R]Rep. Stephen Knight [R]
Rep. Tom Rice [R]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R]Rep. Conor Lamb [D]Rep. Mike Coffman [R]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. Jack Bergman [R]Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. Kevin Yoder [R]
Rep. Tom Marino [R]Rep. Jeff Denham [R]Rep. David Joyce [R]Rep. Mike Kelly [R]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-09-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-09-13HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2018-09-13HouseSubcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-01-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB896 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB4426 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback