US HB4252 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Geothermal Production Expansion Act of 2017 This bill amends the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 to allow the Department of the Interior to award noncompetitive leases on up to 640 acres of federal land for geothermal development if: (1) the land is available for leasing and not already leased or nominated to be leased, (2) the lessee has a legal right to develop geothermal resources on land adjacent to the federal land that will be leased, (3) sufficient data was submitted to Interior to show there is a valid discovery of geothermal resources on the adjacent land and that the thermal feature extends into the adjoining federal land, and (4) the lessee has not previously received a noncompetitive lease for the discovery. Interior must lease the land at fair market value, publish a notice of any lease requests, and provide review of the final determination of fair market value. Lessees must make annual rental payments equal to those required for lands that are leased competitively.
Title
Geothermal Production Expansion Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-11-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
HB4568 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
HB4426 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB4568 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
HB4426 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Alternative and renewable resources
Department of the Interior
Energy
Government information and archives
Land use and conservation
Alternative and renewable resources
Department of the Interior
Energy
Government information and archives
Land use and conservation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4252/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4252/BILLS-115hr4252ih.pdf |