US HB3998 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Securing Access to Networks in Disasters Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to submit to Congress and publish on the FCC website a study on the public safety benefits, technical feasibility, and cost of providing the public with access to 9-1-1 services during times of emergency when mobile service is unavailable, through: telecommunications service provider-owned WiFi access points and other communications technologies operating on unlicensed spectrum, without requiring any login credentials; non-telecommunications service provider-owned WiFi access points; and other alternative means. The types of emergencies subject to this bill are: (1) occasions or instances under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act for which the President determines that federal assistance is needed to supplement state and local efforts and capabilities to save lives and to protect property and public health and safety, or to lessen or avert the threat of a catastrophe in any part of the United States; or (2) an emergency declared by the governor of a state or U.S. territory. (Sec. 3) The Stafford Act is amended to expand the categories of essential service providers that may access a disaster site to restore and repair essential services in an emergency or major disaster without being denied or impeded by a federal agency. Services to be considered essential are wireline or mobile telephone service, Internet access service, radio or television broadcasting, cable service, or direct broadcast satellite service.
Title
Securing Access to Networks in Disasters Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 389 N: 2 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2016-05-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 389 - 2 (Roll no. 230). (text: CR H2890) |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2930) |
2016-05-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-05-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3998. |
2016-05-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2890-2891) |
2016-05-23 | House | Mr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-05-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 453. |
2016-05-23 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-583, Part I. |
2016-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2016-04-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2015-11-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-11-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2997 (Related) 2016-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 702.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication