US HB3622 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements regarding consumer credit information included by a consumer reporting agency on a credit report, including by requiring removal of adverse information that resulted from specified fraudulent lending activity, shortening the time period adverse information stays on reports, and limiting the inclusion of certain medical debt on reports. The bill also requires a consumer reporting agency to provide free credit monitoring and identity theft protection services to certain consumers, including victims of fraud, active duty military, and those 65 years of age and older.
Title
Restoring Unfairly Impaired Credit and Protecting Consumers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287. |
2019-12-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-362. |
2019-07-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 26. |
2019-07-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-07-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3621 (Related) 2020-01-30 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aging
Computer security and identity theft
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Contracts and agency
Crime victims
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Higher education
Housing finance and home ownership
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs
Aging
Computer security and identity theft
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Contracts and agency
Crime victims
Debt collection
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Health care costs and insurance
Higher education
Housing finance and home ownership
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs