US HB3279 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Open Book on Equal Access to Justice Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Equal Access to Justice Act and the federal judicial code to require the Administrative Conference of the United States to report to Congress annually for a specified period on the amount of fees and other expenses awarded to prevailing parties other than the United States in certain administrative proceedings and civil action court cases (excluding tort cases) to which the United States is a party, including settlement agreements. The reports must: (1) describe the number, nature, and amount of the awards, the claims involved in the controversy, and any other relevant information that may aid Congress in evaluating the scope and impact of such awards; and (2) be made available to the public online. The Administrative Conference must create and maintain online searchable databases containing specified information with respect to each award, including the name of the agency involved, the name of each party to whom the award was made, the amount of the award, and the basis for finding that the position of the agency concerned was not substantially justified. Agencies, including the Department of Justice, must provide the Administrative Conference all information requested to comply with such requirements.
Title
Open Book on Equal Access to Justice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. David Trott [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8423) |
2015-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3279. |
2015-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8423-8426) |
2015-11-30 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-11-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 270. |
2015-11-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-351. |
2015-10-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-10-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-22 | House | Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice Discharged. |
2015-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB384 (Related) 2015-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB556 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB556 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government liability
Law
Legal fees and court costs
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government liability
Law
Legal fees and court costs