US HB3215 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Identify [sic] Theft and Tax Fraud Prevention Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) impose a fine and/or prison term on any person who knowingly or willfully misappropriates another person's tax identification number in connection with any list, return, account, statement, or other document submitted to the Internal Revenue Service (IRS); (2) increase the civil and criminal penalties for improper disclosure or use of taxpayer information by tax return preparers; (3) require the Commissioner of Internal Revenue to submit to the Senate Committee on Finance and the House Committee on Ways and Means an annual report on the number of reported cases of tax fraud and suspected tax fraud and the actions taken in response to such reports; and (4) require the head of the Federal Bureau of Prisons to submit to Congress a detailed plan on how it will use tax information provided by the IRS to reduce prison tax fraud. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to: (1) implement an identity theft tax fraud prevention program; and (2) review whether current federal tax law prevents the effective enforcement of local, state, and federal identity theft statutes. Authorizes the Commissioner to transfer appropriated funds to be used solely to prevent and resolve potential tax fraud cases. Directs the Commissioner to establish in the Criminal Investigation Division of the IRS the position of Local Law Enforcement Liaison to coordinate the investigation of tax fraud with state and local law enforcement agencies and communicate the status of tax fraud cases involving identity theft. Directs the Comptroller General to study and report on the role of prepaid debit cards and commercial tax preparation software in facilitating fraudulent tax returns through identity theft. Prohibits the Secretary of Commerce from disclosing information contained on the Death Master File relating to a deceased individual to persons who are not certified to access such information.
Title
Identify Theft and Tax Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1534 (Same As) 2011-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5462)
HB3482 (Related) 2011-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6205 (Related) 2012-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3432 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3482 (Related) 2011-12-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6205 (Related) 2012-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3432 (Related) 2012-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of the Treasury
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Freedom of information
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Appropriations
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of the Treasury
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Freedom of information
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3215/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3215/BILLS-112hr3215ih.pdf |