US HB3094 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the National Pulse Memorial located at 1912 South Orange Avenue, Orlando, Florida, 32806, and for other purposes. This bill redesignates the Pulse Memorial located at 1912 South Orange Avenue in Orlando, Florida, as the "National Pulse Memorial."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the National Pulse Memorial located at 1912 South Orange Avenue, Orlando, Florida, 32806, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2020-03-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2019-12-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-06-12HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4437)
2019-06-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-04HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback