US HB2996 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for congressional approval of national emergency declarations, and for other purposes.
Title
ARTICLE ONE Act Assuring that Robust, Thorough, and Informed Congressional Leadership is Exercised Over National Emergencies Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB241 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2391 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2391 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2996/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2996/BILLS-117hr2996ih.pdf |