US SB2391 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for clarification and limitations with respect to the exercise of national security powers, and for other purposes.
Title
National Security Powers Act of 2021 Arms Export Reform Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2996 (Related) 2021-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB241 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB256 (Related) 2021-06-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB241 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB256 (Related) 2021-06-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2391/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2391/BILLS-117s2391is.pdf |