US HB2922 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-25)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adoptive Family Relief Act This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to declare that if an immigrant visa was issued on or after March 27, 2013, for a child who has been lawfully adopted, or who is coming to the United States to be adopted, by a U.S. citizen, any statutory immigrant visa fees relating to a renewal or replacement of such visa may be waived or refunded if: the child was unable to use the original immigrant visa during the period of its validity as a direct result of extraordinary circumstances, including the denial of an exit permit; and such inability was attributable to factors beyond the control of the adopting parent or parents.
Title
Adoptive Family Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1300 (Same As) 2015-10-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-70. (TXT | PDF)
SB1635 (Related) 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-323.
SB1635 (Related) 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-323.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2922/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2922/BILLS-114hr2922ih.pdf |