US HB2854 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protect Our Refuges Act of 2019 This bill prohibits the use of neonicotinoids (a class of neuroactive insecticides that are chemically similar to nicotine) within the National Wildlife Refuge System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Our Refuges Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-07HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 375.
2020-08-07HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-468.
2019-11-20HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 13.
2019-11-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-11-20HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-09-24HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-06-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-05-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1856 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback