US HB2083 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Endangered Salmon and Fisheries Predation Prevention Act This bill amends the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to authorize the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to issue one-year permits allowing Washington, Oregon, Idaho, the Nez Perce Tribe, the Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, the Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, the Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, the Columbia River Inter-Tribal Fish Commission, and the Cowlitz Indian Tribe to kill sea lions in a portion of the Columbia River or certain tributaries in order to protect fish from sea lion predation. Permits may be issued to kill sea lions only if the sea lions are part of a population that is not depleted. The permits may authorize the lethal taking of 100 sea lions or fewer. The cumulative annual taking of sea lions each year under all such permits is limited to 10% of the annual potential biological removal level. Permit holders must be trained in natural resource management. These permits are exempted from environmental review requirements of the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 for five years. NOAA may suspend the issuance of the permits if, after five years, lethal removal authority is no longer necessary to protect fish from sea lion predation.
Title
Endangered Salmon and Fisheries Predation Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - On passage RC# 294 (Y: 288 N: 116 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-06-26 | House | The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2083. (text as modified: CR H5706) |
2018-06-26 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-26 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 288 - 116 (Roll no. 294). (text: CR H5703-5704) |
2018-06-26 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2018-06-26 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-06-26 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2083. |
2018-06-26 | House | H.Amdt.804 On agreeing to the Vargas amendment (A002) as modified Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-26 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 961, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Vargas amendment No. 3, as modified. |
2018-06-26 | House | H.Amdt.804 Vargas amendment (A002) modified by unanimous consent. |
2018-06-26 | House | H.Amdt.804 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Vargas. (consideration: CR H5704; text as modified: CR H5704) |
2018-06-26 | House | H.Amdt.803 On agreeing to the Kilmer amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-06-26 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 961, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kilmer amendment No. 1. |
2018-06-26 | House | H.Amdt.803 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Kilmer. (consideration: CR H5704; text: CR H5704) |
2018-06-26 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2083. |
2018-06-26 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Ted Poe to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2018-06-26 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 961 and Rule XVIII. |
2018-06-26 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6157 and H.R. 2083. Provides for consideration of H.R. 6157 and H.R. 2083 both under structured rules. |
2018-06-26 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 961. (consideration: CR H5696-5705, H5706) |
2018-06-26 | House | Rule H. Res. 961 passed House. |
2018-06-25 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 961 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 6157 and H.R. 2083. Provides for consideration of H.R. 6157 and H.R. 2083 both under structured rules. |
2017-09-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 208. |
2017-09-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-289. |
2017-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14. |
2017-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1702 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR961 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3119 (Related) 2018-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-329.
SB3315 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR961 (Related) 2018-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3119 (Related) 2018-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-329.
SB3315 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Animals
Endangered and threatened species
Fishes
Idaho
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Endangered and threatened species
Fishes
Idaho
Indian lands and resources rights
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Washington State
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection