US HR961 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6157) making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2083) to amend the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to reduce predation on endangered Columbia River salmon and other nonlisted species, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6157) making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2083) to amend the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to reduce predation on endangered Columbia River salmon and other nonlisted species.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6157) making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2083) to amend the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to reduce predation on endangered Columbia River salmon and other nonlisted species, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 291 (Y: 219 N: 172 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 292 (Y: 222 N: 172 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 292 (Y: 222 N: 172 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-26 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 222 - 172 (Roll no. 292). (text: CR H5668-5669) |
2018-06-26 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 172 (Roll no. 291). (consideration: CR H5668) |
2018-06-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 961. |
2018-06-26 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5668-5673) |
2018-06-25 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 158. |
2018-06-25 | House | Provides for consideration of H.R. 6157 and H.R. 2083 both under structured rules. |
2018-06-25 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-783, by Ms. Cheney. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2083 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HR961 (Similar To) 2018-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6157 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-245.
HR1077 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR961 (Similar To) 2018-06-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6157 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Became Public Law No: 115-245.
HR1077 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.