US HB2068 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Education Relief and Restoration Act of 2017 This bill declares that, if a veteran is forced to discontinue a course as a result of a a permanent school closure and did not receive credit or lost training time toward completion of the education program, Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) educational assistance payments shall not, for a specified period of time, be: charged against the individual's entitlement to educational assistance, or counted against the aggregate period for which such assistance may be provided. The bill applies to courses and programs of education discontinued beginning with FY2015. The VA may continue to pay educational assistance and subsistence allowances to eligible veterans and eligible persons enrolled in specified courses for up to 4 weeks in any 12-month period when schools are temporarily closed under an established policy based on an executive order of the President or due to an emergency situation. The VA may also continue to pay a monthly housing stipend following a permanent school closure, but only until the earlier of: (1) the date of the end of the term, quarter, or semester during which the school closure occurred; and (2) the date that is four months after the school closure.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Veterans Education Relief and Restoration Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1216 (Related) 2017-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB1489 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3372 (Related) 2017-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2698 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB1489 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3372 (Related) 2017-07-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2698 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2068/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2068/BILLS-115hr2068ih.pdf |