US HB1996 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Social Security Numbers and Benefits for Illegal Aliens Act of 2015 Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to prohibit the Commissioner of Social Security from assigning a Social Security account number to any individual who receives deferred action on removal in accordance with certain Department of Homeland Security memoranda dated June 15, 2012 and November 20, 2014, and who would be subject to removal but for such memoranda. Prohibits the payment of OASDI benefits to such individuals. Denies the crediting of quarters of coverage toward benefits for earnings from unauthorized work by an individual who is not a U.S. citizen or national and who was not authorized to be employed in the United States. Prohibits counting an individual's annual wages or self-employment income for any year for which no quarter of coverage may be credited. Directs the Commissioner and the Secretary to enter into an agreement to establish a system to transmit to the Secretary any Social Security account number assigned to an individual after the enactment of this Act, as well as other identifying information, in any case in which the individual is not a U.S. citizen or national at the time that number is assigned.
Title
No Social Security Numbers and Benefits for Illegal Aliens Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Johnson [R-TX] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1996/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1996/BILLS-114hr1996ih.pdf |