US HB1960 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanent Death Tax Repeal Act of 2009 - Makes permanent the provisions of the Economic Growth and Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2001 (EGTRRA) that repeal the estate and generation skipping transfer taxes and that make reductions in the gift tax.
Title
Permanent Death Tax Repeal Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Alexander [R-LA] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] |
Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] |
Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI] | Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] |
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Todd Tiahrt [R-KS] | Rep. Zach Wamp [R-TN] |
Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB205 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB533 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3463 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB533 (Related) 2009-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3463 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1960/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1960/BILLS-111hr1960ih.pdf |