US HB1951 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a court to reduce a prison term imposed on a defendant convicted as an adult for an offense committed as a juvenile if (1) the defendant has served at least 20 years in custody, and (2) the defendant is not a danger to public safety.
Title
To amend title 18, United States Code, to authorize a court to reduce the term of imprisonment imposed on certain defendants convicted as an adult for an offense committed and completed before the defendant attained 18 years of age, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government information and archives
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government information and archives
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1951/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1951/BILLS-116hr1951ih.pdf |