US SB697 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Next Step Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Next Step Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB196 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1076 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB1456 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB387 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
SB597 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1893 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2232 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1080 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1951 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1068 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2410 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2865 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of Defense
Detention of persons
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Firearms and explosives
Food assistance and relief
General Services Administration
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Housing and community development funding
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Personnel records
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Voting rights

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback