US SB2850 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to focus limited Federal resources on the most serious offenders.
Title
Smarter Sentencing Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7270 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7270 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. Sentencing Commission
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2850/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2850/BILLS-116s2850is.pdf |