US HB1915 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Small Business Act to provide the Administrator of the Small Business Administration authority to increase amount for general business loans, and for other purposes. This bill amends the Small Business Act to provide that if the amount of Small Business Administration (SBA) commitments for authorized general business loans for a fiscal year exceeds the limit on the total amount of commitments the SBA may make for such loans under such Act, the SBA may make such commitments for such loans for such fiscal year in a total amount equal to up to 120% of that limit. The SBA may not exercise this authority without prior approval of specified congressional committees.
Title
To amend the Small Business Act to provide the Administrator of the Small Business Administration authority to increase amount for general business loans, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4743 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-189.
SB2283 (Related) 2018-06-05 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-265.
HR899 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2283 (Related) 2018-06-05 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-265.
HR899 (Similar To) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1915/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1915/BILLS-115hr1915ih.pdf |