US SB2283 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business 7(a) Lending Oversight Reform Act of 2018 This bill amends the Small Business Act to provide statutory authority for the Small Business Administration (SBA) Office of Credit Risk Management and the SBA Lender Oversight Committee. For FY2018 and each ensuing fiscal year, the SBA may, with congressional approval, increase the cap for general business loans if the cap will be reached within that fiscal year. An increase may only be implemented once each fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business 7(a) Lending Oversight Reform Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05SenateBy Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-265.
2018-05-15SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-322.
2018-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 351.
2018-03-19SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-03-14SenateCommittee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-01-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.

Same As/Similar To

HB4743 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-189.
HB1915 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HR899 (Related) 2018-05-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback