US HB1868 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-7. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes several budgetary and technical changes to provisions under Medicare and Medicaid. The bill continues to exempt Medicare from sequestration until December 31, 2021. (Sequestration is a process of automatic, usually across-the-board spending reductions under which budgetary resources are permanently cancelled to enforce specific budget policy goals.) The bill also specifically applies certain modified payment limits to rural health clinics that temporarily enrolled in Medicare during the public health emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) or that applied to enroll by December 31, 2020; and preserves higher Medicaid disproportionate-share hospital payments for public hospitals in California under forthcoming payment methodology changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent across-the-board direct spending cuts, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - On motion that the House suspend the rules and concur in the Senate amendment (Y: 384 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment RC# 142 (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Amendment SA 1411 S.Amdt.1411 RC# 141 (Y: 47 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - House - On passage (Y: 246 N: 175 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - On motion to recommit (Y: 202 N: 216 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseBecame Public Law No: 117-7. (TXT | PDF)
2021-04-14HouseSigned by President.
2021-04-14HousePresented to President.
2021-04-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-04-13HouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 38 (Roll no. 98). (text: CR H1729-1730)
2021-04-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and concur in the Senate amendment to H.R. 1868.
2021-04-13HouseMr. Yarmuth moved that the House suspend the rules and concur in the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H1729-1733)
2021-03-26SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-03-25SenatePassed Senate, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 90 - 2. Record Vote Number: 142. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1801-1802)
2021-03-25SenateS.Amdt.1410 Amendment SA 1410 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
2021-03-25SenateS.Amdt.1411 Amendment SA 1411 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 50. Record Vote Number: 141.
2021-03-25SenateS.Amdt.1411 Amendment SA 1411 proposed by Senator Scott FL to Amendment SA 1410. (consideration: CR S1802; text: CR S1802) To improve the bill.
2021-03-25SenateS.Amdt.1410 Amendment SA 1410 proposed by Senator Shaheen. (consideration: CR S1801-1804; text: CR S1801-1802) In the nature of a substitute.
2021-03-25SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1800-1804)
2021-03-25SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 31.
2021-03-24SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2021-03-22SenateReceived in the Senate.
2021-03-19HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-03-19HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 175 (Roll no. 96). (text: CR H1589-1590)
2021-03-19HouseOn motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 216 (Roll no. 95).
2021-03-19HouseMr. Smith (MO) moved to recommit to the Committee on the Budget. (text: CR H1598-1600)
2021-03-19HouseThe previous question was ordered without objection.
2021-03-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1868.
2021-03-19HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868 and H.J. Res. 17. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868, and H.J.Res. 17. The resolution provides that H.Res. 232 is hereby adopted.
2021-03-19HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 233. (consideration: CR H1589-1601)
2021-03-16HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 233 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868 and H.J. Res. 17. The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1620, H.R. 6, H.R. 1603, H.R. 1868, and H.J.Res. 17. The resolution provides that H.Res. 232 is hereby adopted.
2021-03-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-03-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR233 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB935 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1885 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback