US HB1684 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Foreign Spill Protection Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Oil Pollution Act of 1990 to make foreign facilities that are located offshore and outside the boundary of the exclusive economic zone (EEZ) liable for removal costs and damages that result from oil spills that reach (or threaten to reach) U.S. navigable waters, adjoining shorelines, or the EEZ. Specifically, the following parties may be held liable: (1) the owners or operators of the foreign facilities, and (2) the holders of a right of use and easement granted under applicable foreign law for the area in which the facility is located.
Title
Foreign Spill Protection Act of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2016-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1959) |
2016-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1684. |
2016-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1959-1961) |
2016-04-26 | House | Mr. Curbelo (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-04-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 398. |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-518. |
2016-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2951 (Related) 2016-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.