US HB1501 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the Secretary of Homeland Security from operating or procuring certain foreign-made unmanned aircraft systems, and for other purposes.
Title
Unmanned Aerial Security Act UAS Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Mike Ezell [R-MS] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] |
Rep. Morgan Luttrell [R-TX] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Laurel Lee [R-FL] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2023-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-07-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: 7/25/2023 CR H3936-3937) |
2023-07-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4052) |
2023-07-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Guest objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2023-07-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1501. |
2023-07-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3936-3938) |
2023-07-25 | House | Mr. Guest moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 119. |
2023-07-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 118-151. |
2023-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight, Investigations, and Accountability Discharged. |
2023-05-17 | House | Subcommittee on Counterterrorism, Law Enforcement, and Intelligence Discharged. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Investigations, and Accountability. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism, Law Enforcement, and Intelligence. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4531 (Related) 2023-12-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.