US HB1359 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secure and Responsible Drug Disposal Act of 2009 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to allow an ultimate user who has lawfully obtained a controlled substance to deliver that substance to another person, without being registered, for the purpose of disposal if: (1) the person receiving the substance is authorized to engage in such activity; and (2) the disposal takes place in accordance with regulations issued by the Attorney General to prevent diversion of controlled substances. Permits the Attorney General to authorize long-term care facilities to dispose of controlled substances on behalf of ultimate users in a manner that will provide effective controls against diversion and that is consistent with public health and safety.
Title
Secure and Responsible Drug Disposal Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Bart Stupak [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-03-06 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1292 (Same As) 2009-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3397 (Related) 2010-10-12 - Became Public Law No: 111-273.
SB3397 (Related) 2010-10-12 - Became Public Law No: 111-273.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health facilities and institutions
Prescription drugs
Solid waste and recycling
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Health facilities and institutions
Prescription drugs
Solid waste and recycling
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1359/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1359/BILLS-111hr1359ih.pdf |