TX SB411 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring public institutions of higher education to make available to students certain pregnancy-related informational materials published by the Department of State Health Services.
Title
Relating to requiring public institutions of higher education to make available to students certain pregnancy-related informational materials published by the Department of State Health Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB411 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00411I.htm |