TX SB373 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
Title
Relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - SB 373Third Reading House (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-19 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Amended |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Hospitals
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF