TX SB298 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the pickup and delivery of alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the pickup and delivery of alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-01-07SenateFiled
2021-01-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1024 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Sent to the Governor
HB983 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
HB1102 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
HB1779 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback