TX HB1024 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the pickup and delivery of alcoholic beverages from certain premises for off-premises consumption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the pickup and delivery of alcoholic beverages from certain premises for off-premises consumption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#46 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12 Effective immediately
2021-05-12 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-03SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-04-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-29HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-28SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-04-12SenateRead first time
2021-03-25SenateReceived from the House
2021-03-25HouseReported engrossed
2021-03-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-25HouseRecord vote RV#46
2021-03-25HousePassed
2021-03-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-24HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-24HouseAmended 1-Geren
2021-03-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB298 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1024
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01024I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01024H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01024E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01024S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01024F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01024H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01024I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01024H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01024H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01024E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01024E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1024&RcdVtNo=46&Ch=H&Dt=03/25/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=22

Bill Comments 750

feedback