TX SB224 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1410 (Y: 117 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1410
2021-05-24HousePassed as amended
2021-05-24HouseAmended 1-Landgraf and Hull
2021-05-24HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-24HousePostponed 5/24/21 12:15 PM
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-04-13HouseRead first time
2021-04-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-08SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenatePassed
2021-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-08SenateRecord vote
2021-04-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-24SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateCo-author authorized
2020-12-02SenateFiled
2020-12-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB701 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
HB1019 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB224
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00224I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00224S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00224E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00224H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00224F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00224H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00224I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00224I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00224H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00224F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00224F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-08-F.PDF#page=32
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB224&RcdVtNo=1410&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=20

Bill Comments

feedback