TX HB1019 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB224 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB1532 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1795 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1532 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1795 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Health & Human Services