TX HB701 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB224 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB1532 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback