DC B25-0049 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-49 would allow applicants for local rent supplement vouchers to self-certify eligibility factors. It would prohibit the Housing Authority from inquiring into an applicant’s immigration status or prior criminal arrests, conviction, or pending criminal matters.
Title
Local Rent Supplement Program Eligibility Amendment Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-25 | Council | Public Hearing Cancelled |
2023-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-28 | Council | Cancellation Notice of Public Hearing Filed |
2023-03-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-03-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing |
2023-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0049 Published in the DC Register |
2023-01-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0049 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52109/Introduction/B25-0049-Introduction.pdf |