CA SB898 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-23 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 352.1 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 1170 and 1172.1 of, and to add Section 2637.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: sexual assault resentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB898 Skinner (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-08-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
2024-08-07AssemblyAugust 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-07-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2024-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2024-06-13Assembly(Corrected June 13.)
2024-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2024-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-05-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4081.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2024-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2024-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4. Page 3731.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-04-02SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2024-03-25SenateApril 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2024-02-28SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2024-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2024-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2024-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure352.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1170Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1172.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2637.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898#93AMD
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB898

Bill Comments

feedback