TX SB1683 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to the distribution of proceeds from the sale of forfeited property in a criminal case.
Title
Relating to the distribution of proceeds from the sale of forfeited property in a criminal case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-20 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-20 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2062 (Same As) 2009-05-27 - Effective immediately
HB2993 (Same As) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB2993 (Same As) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Subjects
CATTLE RAISERS ASSOCIATION, TEXAS & SOUTHWESTERN
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL ASSET FORFEITURE
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General