TX SB1425 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an account for construction retainage; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to an account for construction retainage; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time | |
2011-05-18 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-18 | Record vote | |
2011-05-18 | Passed | |
2011-05-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-18 | Record vote | |
2011-05-18 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
LOANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property
LOANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Real Property