TX SB1346 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of certain littering offenses.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of certain littering offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1937 (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1865 (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-19 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1865 (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1937 |
2023-05-22 | House | Passed |
2023-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1865 |
2023-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
LITTER
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
LITTER
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions