TX SB1215 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-13 - Referred to State Affairs
Summary
Relating to lobbying by former members of the legislature; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to lobbying by former members of the legislature; creating an offense.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed | |
2009-02-27 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2089 (Similar To) 2009-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2430 (Similar To) 2009-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2430 (Similar To) 2009-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs