TX SB1153 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Public Utility Commission of Texas to participate in certain proceedings before the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Public Utility Commission of Texas to participate in certain proceedings before the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Effective immediately | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-10 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-10 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-09 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-09 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-09 | Record vote | |
2011-05-09 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-09 | Read | |
2011-05-09 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-05 | Amended | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-04 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-04 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-04 | Amended | |
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-04 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed | |
2011-03-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric