TX HR63 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the Sons of the American Legion National Convention in Houston on August 23 to 25, 2013.
Title
Commemorating the Sons of the American Legion National Convention in Houston on August 23 to 25, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-21 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-21 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-06-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-06-20 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-06-13 | House | Filed |