TX HR2222 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing May 8, 2015, as International Junior Miss Texas Day.
Title
Recognizing May 8, 2015, as International Junior Miss Texas Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-04-22 | House | Filed |