TX HR1303 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Summary
In memory of U.S. Army Sergeant First Class Raymond Munden.
Title
In memory of U.S. Army Sergeant First Class Raymond Munden.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-23 | Adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |