TX HJR77 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Referred to Education
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Referred to Education
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to create the Permanent School Fund Management Council to assume the duty of the State Board of Education to manage the permanent school fund and to allow the School Land Board to transfer funds from the permanent school fund to the available school fund.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to create the Permanent School Fund Management Council to assume the duty of the State Board of Education to manage the permanent school fund and to allow the School Land Board to transfer funds from the permanent school fund to the available school fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Warren Chisum [R] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Rob Eissler [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Referred to Education | |
2009-05-11 | Read first time | |
2009-04-28 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-27 | Record vote | |
2009-04-27 | Adopted as amended | |
2009-04-27 | Amended | |
2009-04-27 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-27 | Postponed | |
2009-04-27 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2009-04-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-27 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2037 (Enabled by) 2009-05-04 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND MANAGEMENT COUNCIL
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND MANAGEMENT COUNCIL
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control