TX HB4092 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.
Title
Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-26 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-25 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DENTAL SERVICES
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Science & Technology
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Science & Technology