TX HB4028 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training for county election officers.
Title
Relating to training for county election officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB231 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
SECRETARY OF STATE
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
County Government--Employees/Officers
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
SECRETARY OF STATE
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING