TX SB231 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to training for county election officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to training for county election officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1286 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1286
2021-05-20HousePassed
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-03-24SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-12-04SenateFiled
2020-12-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4028 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB231
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00231I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00231S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00231E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00231H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00231F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00231I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00231I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00231E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00231H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00231F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB231&RcdVtNo=1286&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021

Bill Comments

feedback