TX HB3924 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health benefits offered by certain nonprofit agricultural organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health benefits offered by certain nonprofit agricultural organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1568 (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Amendment withdrawn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Amended RV#726 (Y: 106 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#704 (Y: 93 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#703 (Y: 69 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#702 (Y: 67 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#701 (Y: 66 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#700 (Y: 60 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1568
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-05-22SenateVote reconsidered
2021-05-22SenateVote reconsidered
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed as amended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateAmended
2021-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateAmended
2021-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Springer
2021-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20SenateAmended
2021-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Springer
2021-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-17SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#726
2021-05-05HousePassed as amended
2021-05-05HouseAmended 1-Oliverson and Martinez Fischer
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#704
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#703
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 6-S. Thompson and Davis
2021-05-04HouseAmendment withdrawn 5-Martinez Fischer
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#702
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-Zwiener
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#701
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-C. Turner
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#700
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Israel
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Oliverson
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Insurance
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1973 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
SB1973 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03924I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03924H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03924E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03924S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03924F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924H25.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924H26.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03924S3F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03924I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03924H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03924H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03924E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03924E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03924F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924&RcdVtNo=700&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924&RcdVtNo=701&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924&RcdVtNo=702&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924&RcdVtNo=703&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924&RcdVtNo=704&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924&RcdVtNo=726&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=47
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3924&RcdVtNo=1568&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback